Financial history JOES COMMUNITY SEWING PROJECT

Charity number: 1099265
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2009 31/05/2010 31/05/2011 31/05/2012 31/05/2013
Total gross income £1.92k £1.92k £1.92k £1.92k £1.92k
Total expenditure £1.92k £1.92k £1.92k £1.90k £1.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A