Financial history SCHOOL'S OUT

Charity number: 1094629
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £66.28k £56.98k £52.76k £56.09k £77.30k
Total expenditure £65.13k £55.13k £52.44k £55.68k £78.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £23.96k £3.17k N/A N/A