Financial history MENDHAM AND WITHERSDALE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1102602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £18.07k £14.37k £8.62k £11.47k £19.81k
Total expenditure £12.73k £11.75k £11.96k £10.92k £20.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.11k N/A £1.40k £1.00k