Financial history BRIGHTNESS LTD

Charity number: 1095724
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2005 30/06/2006 30/06/2007 30/06/2008 30/06/2009
Total gross income £49.06k £73.83k £511.85k £326.51k £910.10k
Total expenditure £47.25k £79.70k £212.10k £627.34k £923.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £510.80k N/A £910.04k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £1.05k N/A £60
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £210.46k N/A £922.32k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £1.53k N/A £1.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £210.46k N/A £922.32k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £115 N/A £0