Financial history FLAME UK - FRIENDS OF LITERACY & MASS EDUCATION

Charity number: 1096911
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £7.69k £1.00k £415 £110 £50
Total expenditure £4.52k £5.00k £300 £13.00k £10
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A