Accounts and annual returns FAIR

Charity number: 1095334
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2008 11 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 27 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 30 November 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 12 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 12 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 02 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 02 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 16 February 2005 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 08 July 2005 158 days late