Financial history ENGLAND RUGBY FOOTBALL SCHOOLS' UNION

Charity Number: 1095798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £104.32k £3.79k £11.63k £28.15k £29.73k
Total expenditure £73.65k £14.79k £53.67k £56.28k £43.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A