Financial history PITSTONE RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 1094867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £780 £300 £1.91k £1.14k £1.58k
Total expenditure £72 £72 £3.23k £1.27k £72
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A