Accounts and annual returns THE THINK AHEAD COMMUNITY STROKE GROUP

Charity number: 1094255
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 02 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 06 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 19 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 19 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 24 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 16 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2006 13 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 13 December 2006 On Time