Accounts and annual returns SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICT IYENGAR YOGA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1095177
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 29 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required