Accounts and annual returns THE BATTY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1094948
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 30 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 29 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 02 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 21 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 21 February 2007 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 21 February 2007 21 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 30 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 30 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time