Accounts and annual returns GOSPEL EMPOWERMENT MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1098401
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 08 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 31 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 31 October 2008 274 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted