Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF GUILDFORD CHANTRIES

Charity number: 1095536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £12.95k £7.09k £4.44k £9.39k £8.51k
Total expenditure £11.80k £8.13k £3.32k £11.07k £8.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A