Financial history SPRINGBOARD THERAPEUTIC ACTIVITIES TRUST

Charity number: 1100282
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2004 30/04/2005 30/04/2006 30/04/2007 31/08/2008
Total gross income £7 £6.57k £10.63k £9.75k £14.32k
Total expenditure £537 £5.79k £9.83k £8.57k £13.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A