Accounts and annual returns THE VIDA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1096985
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2009 15 February 2010 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2008 18 March 2009 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2007 04 April 2008 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2006 14 February 2007 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2005 27 April 2006 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 Not Required