Financial history LOVE SABRI

Charity number: 1097978
Charity reporting is overdue by 277 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £1.00k £650 £1.01k £360 £180
Total expenditure £0 £480 £0 £240 £4.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A