Financial history CORNWALL ADVOCACY

Charity number: 1102081
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.89k £19.92k £20.18k £39.49k £7.31k
Total expenditure £46.62k £17.67k £13.63k £39.26k £11.26k
Income from government contracts £1.67k £18.33k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £20.00k £34.31k N/A