Accounts and annual returns HARPERLEY POW MUSEUM
Charity number: 1099563
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 12 November 2008 | 165 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 04 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 05 April 2005 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window