Accounts and annual returns SWANLEY DARTFORD AND GRAVESEND AFTER BREAST CANCER SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1095449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 17 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 31 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 10 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required