Trustees THE ELIZA & ROBERT CALDWELL TRUST
Charity number: 1095943

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susannah Manning | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Griffith | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Christopher Andrew Beale | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Felix Samuel | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN GRIFFITH | Trustee | 19 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ASIRVATHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV CANON HENRY GERVIS PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CHLOE GERSKOWITCH | Trustee |
|
||||||
JONATHAN WYATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Juliet Draper | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.