Accounts and annual returns RISE PHOENIX

Charity number: 1097280
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 11 March 2008 40 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 10 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 16 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 15 February 2006 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 15 February 2006 15 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 22 February 2005 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 22 February 2005 22 days late