Financial history 9TH KNOWSLEY (HALEWOOD) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1096145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.78k £1.64k £1.50k £8.00k £44.60k
Total expenditure £3.82k £1.70k £2.17k £5.45k £42.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £33.15k