Financial history FRIENDS OF THE DATCHET HEALTH CENTRE

Charity number: 1098325
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £4.60k £1.75k £5.11k £256 £627
Total expenditure £22.90k £5.77k £615 £8.95k £492
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A