Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN LLOYD PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1096383
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2012 09 September 2013 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2011 14 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required