Financial history TRIBUNAL REPRESENTATION AND APPEAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1097228
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/04/2007 29/04/2008 29/04/2009 29/04/2010 29/04/2013
Total gross income £10.88k £10.03k £6.94k £66.66k £0
Total expenditure £8.66k £10.81k £8.00k £51.16k £800
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A