Financial history LONDON ETHNIC MINORITIES DEAF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1101280
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £47.54k £56.32k £36.75k £39.08k £55.61k
Total expenditure £53.09k £57.29k £28.88k £47.88k £46.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A