Financial history SEND SCHOOLS’ PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1096162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £11.72k £1.03k £20.50k £9.71k £6.91k
Total expenditure £4.26k £253 £15.25k £5.72k £8.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.00k N/A N/A