Financial history QUEEN ELEANOR'S SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1096184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.79k £4.12k £22.07k £15.93k £17.56k
Total expenditure £5.24k £3.46k £14.32k £17.14k £22.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A