Accounts and annual returns THE JAFFNA TRUST

Charity number: 1101290
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 08 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 02 August 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 11 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 11 September 2007 223 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 21 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required