Financial history THE BREAST CANCER ACTION GROUP (WOLVERHAMPTON & DISTRICT)

Charity number: 1095890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.99k £1.91k £2.43k £5.98k £5.85k
Total expenditure £9.29k £2.87k £4.18k £41.71k £130
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A