Accounts and annual returns THE MILLOM & HAVERIGG ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT GROUP

Charity number: 1112335
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 24 November 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 16 June 2011 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 29 December 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 27 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 11 February 2009 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 31 January 2009 On Time