Financial history HEXTABLE VILLAGE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1099374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £117.84k £130.12k £145.31k £158.84k £169.49k
Total expenditure £109.55k £122.15k £137.17k £175.48k £191.61k
Income from government contracts £91.82k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £107.61k £117.64k £124.46k £130.06k