Financial history CATON COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1096315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.26k £1.88k £4.86k £4.99k £2.62k
Total expenditure £6.40k £1.53k £2.20k £7.05k £2.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A