Accounts and annual returns EDEN VALLEY VINE

Charity Number: 1097449
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2010 03 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 21 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 12 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required