Accounts and annual returns MANCHESTER LESBIAN COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity Number: 1098158
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 March 2011 27 March 2012 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2011 13 March 2012 43 days late
Annual return 30 March 2010 26 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2010 26 January 2011 On Time