Accounts and annual returns Charing School PTFA

Charity number: 1096620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 13 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 27 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 30 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required