Financial history CHERISHED MEMORIES SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1097465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £40.00k £65.07k £6.93k £127 £1.11k
Total expenditure £58.38k £32.08k £30.61k £7.47k £3.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A