Accounts and annual returns SIGNPOST YOUNG PEOPLE'S ADVICE AND INFORMATION CENTRE LTD

Charity Number: 1096531
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 30 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 16 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 16 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 28 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 22 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 22 December 2005 On Time