Financial history BEAP

Charity number: 1098088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £209.58k £518.07k £569.67k £368.12k £351.73k
Total expenditure £248.49k £208.04k £524.99k £295.17k £359.84k
Income from government contracts £70.00k £40.00k N/A £160.00k £90.00k
Income from government grants £4.50k £127.30k N/A £100.00k £34.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £449.45k £516.67k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £68.62k £53.00k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £4 £3 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £208.04k £524.99k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.56k £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A