Governing document BRITISH POSTMARK SOCIETY
Charity Number: 1102748

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 NOVEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 21 FEBRUARY 2004 as amended on 23 Feb 2013 as amended on 01 Apr 2021 as amended on 25 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND TO CO-ORDINATE THE STUDY AND COLLECTION OF BRITISH POSTAL MARKINGS, PARTICULARLY OF THE 20TH CENTURY AND SUBSEQUENTLY, AND THE MEANS AND MECHANISMS BY WHICH THEY ARE APPLIED AND TO PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY FOR THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.