Accounts and annual returns ARABIC SPEAKING WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1099835
Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 April 2021 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required