Accounts and annual returns THE BARBARA TAYLOR TRUST

Charity number: 1097472
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required