Trustees TOSALISANA CONGOLESE COMMUNITY OF SHEFFIELD
Charity number: 1098245

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUJANGI JACQUES KALENGA Mr Kalenga | Chair | 01 October 2005 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mozo | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wa Mujangi Kalenga Lin | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ILUNGA SHAMBUYI | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Omer Cishimbi Milambu Omer | Trustee | 16 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev DJOLLY BAVWIDILA MPANZU | Trustee | 29 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS LILIANE MUKADI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS MAMY NTOMBOKOLO | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.