Financial history FRIENDS OF SOQOTRA

Charity number: 1097546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.23k £1.10k £1.70k £319 £1.02k
Total expenditure £4.56k £870 £411 £581 £345
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A