Accounts and annual returns EDWINSTOWE ARTS, HERITAGE AND FESTIVAL ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1100122
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 22 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 23 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 07 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 10 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 10 January 2008 On Time