Financial history STAPLES ROAD SCHOOLS PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1097511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.90k £12.15k £45.49k £49.87k £49.08k
Total expenditure £2.45k £5.03k £48.76k £44.66k £33.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A