Accounts and annual returns GOOD SAMARITAN FOUNDATION (G.S.F)

Charity number: 1105110
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 09 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 09 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 09 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 09 March 2011 31 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 09 March 2010 09 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 March 2010 Not Required