Accounts and annual returns THE JOANNE WEBB MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1105364
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 April 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 03 April 2010 11 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 03 April 2009 16 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 03 April 2008 04 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2008 Not Required