Accounts and annual returns RSD UK

Charity Number: 1100140
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 28 July 2006 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 28 July 2006 178 days late
Annual return 30 September 2004 08 May 2006 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 27 February 2006 212 days late