Accounts and annual returns RAUNDS ST PETERS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1097771
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 31 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required